Financial history ST JAMES AND ST JOHN PARENTS, TEACHERS, FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1016891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.14k £2.84k £9.30k £7.36k £9.37k
Total expenditure £11.10k £3.02k £5.33k £14.24k £13.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A