BLOOMFIELD LEARNING CENTRE FOR CHILDREN LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bloomfield Learning Centre is an assessment and teaching unit for children and young adults with dyslexia and other specific learning difficulties. We work primarily with children from poor socio-economic backgrounds whose families are unable to pay for specialist literacy teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 January 1993: Standard registration
- BLOOMFIELD LEARNING CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BRAMHALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Chris Bromby | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Grace Anders | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saul Lemar | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Will Bloomfield | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY WELCH | Trustee | 03 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE ORR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219.42k | £202.50k | £206.60k | £201.94k | £216.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.60k | £194.84k | £210.77k | £213.06k | £249.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN BY ALL AVAILABLE MEANS A LEARNING CENTRE FOR YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 7 AND 16 YEARS OLD WHO POSSESS SOME DEGREE OF LEARNING DISORDERS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LONDON AND THE SOUTH EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Munro Centre
66 Snowsfields
London
SE1 3SS
- Phone:
- 02032289766
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window