ACLE EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1016912
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2004

Total income: £3,195
Total expenditure: £3,036

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 1993: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • ACLE EVENING WI (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004
Total gross income £3.20k
Total expenditure £3.04k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2004 07 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required