THE ROYAL COLLECTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To ensure the Royal Collection is subject to proper custodial control and is conserved to the highest possible standards. To ensure the Royal Collection can be seen by as many people as possible. To broaden access through the publication of books and exhibition catalogues and development of the on-line gallery. To make appropriate acquisitions when resources become available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£84,343,000
Donations and legacies | £129.00k | |
Charitable activities | £56.86m | |
Other trading activities | £26.85m | |
Investments | £333.00k | |
Other | £175.00k |
Total expenditure:
£72,158,000
Raising funds | £23.27m | |
Charitable activities | £47.11m | |
Other | £1.79m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £25.05m | |
Charitable expenditure | £47.11m | |
Retained for future use | £12.19m |
People

923 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 9 |
£80k to £90k | 5 |
£140k to £150k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 February 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Chalmers | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
The Right Honourable Lord Richard Benyon | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sir Nicholas Bacon Bt KCVO | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
The Rt. Hon. Sir Clive Alderton KCVO | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Tonya Nelson | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Monisha Shah | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Sir Brian Ivory | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ANNA JULIA KEAY | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
VICE ADMIRAL CHARLES ANTHONY JOHNSTONE-BURT CB OBE DL | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Marc Jan Bolland | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.53m | £6.88m | £24.04m | £61.89m | £84.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.93m | £43.19m | £39.05m | £53.93m | £72.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £95.26k | £0 | £391.65k | £135.49k | £129.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £20.93m | £4.04m | £10.58m | £23.75m | £26.85m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £50.13m | £2.70m | £13.02m | £37.89m | £56.86m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £296.13k | £108.68k | £1.03k | £6.57k | £333.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £78.21k | £25.19k | £49.32k | £104.40k | £175.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £49.43m | £33.96m | £26.73m | £32.35m | £47.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £17.73m | £8.57m | £10.96m | £19.56m | £23.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £219.31k | £284.48k | £227.33k | £268.44k | £280.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £769.87k | £659.31k | £1.35m | £2.02m | £1.79m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £54.65m | £54.56m | £50.82m | £47.58m | £45.84m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £31.91m | £20.12m | £9.07m | £10.64m | £11.37m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £1.80m | £1.70m | £4.70m | £2.70m | £2.40m | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.13m | £38.67m | £38.90m | £29.26m | £16.17m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 APR 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 NOV 2012 as amended on 10 Mar 2021 as amended on 10 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
1.FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NATION (A) TO ADMINISTER, CONSERVE, RENOVATE, REPAIR, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVISE ON THE ROYAL COLLECTION, THE ROYAL ARCHIVES AND THE ROYAL PHOTOGRAPHIC COLLECTION WHICH PASS IN RIGHT OF THE CROWN; AND (B) TO EDUCATE AND INFORM THE PUBLIC ABOUT SUCH COLLECTIONS AND ARCHIVES BY EXHIBITION, BY PREPARATION OF CATALOGUES AND INVENTORIES, BY RESEARCH AND BY PUBLICATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS ARE APPROPRIATE; 2. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
YORK HOUSE
ST. JAMES'S PALACE
LONDON
SW1A 1BQ
- Phone:
- (0)20 7930 4832
- Email:
- press@rct.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window