GUILD OF ST MARY'S CENTRE LICHFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides and operates a visual and performing arts venue that is affordable and accessible for all. It provides a vibrant and engaging museum and Treasury display of silver together with inspirational education and arts experiences and access to SCC Local Records digitally. Several thousand photographs of local historical interest are available for public viewing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £114,940 from 1 government contract(s) and £41,058 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 04 February 1993: Standard registration
- LICHFIELD HERITAGE CENTRE (Working name)
- ST MARY'S CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS GEORGE SEDGWICK | Chair | 25 July 2013 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Francis Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Debra Jane McGregor | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
John Douglas James | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Louise Love-Wilson | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Douglas McBain Armour | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Waldron | Trustee | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew John Garfield | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Peter Ablitt | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
SIMON RODERICK JAMES | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
Andrew Brian Sims | Trustee | 26 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.95k | £321.47k | £362.93k | £371.34k | £431.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.85k | £263.33k | £349.35k | £468.86k | £514.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £91.00k | £106.11k | £109.38k | £110.34k | £114.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.37k | £112.38k | £121.73k | £27.63k | £41.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JANUARY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 24 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF THE AGED AND INFIRM GENERALLY.2.THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC RESIDENT IN AND VISITING THE CITY OF LICHFIELD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE.3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC.5.FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE GUILD IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
CITY OF LICHFIELD AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Guild of St Mary's Centre
The Hub at St Mary's
Market Square
Lichfield
Staffordshire
WS13 6LG
- Phone:
- 01543256611
- Email:
- hello@thehubstmarys.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window