KEYBOARD CHARITABLE TRUST FOR YOUNG PROFESSIONAL PERFORMERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To bring talented young keyboard players before the public, by developing new performing opportunities and new audiences. It organises recitals which serve to introduce them to the public and to members of the music profession who can assist their careers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Ealing
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Manchester City
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Surrey
- Argentina
- Austria
- Brazil
- Chile
- Cyprus
- Germany
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Mexico
- Russia
- Scotland
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 05 February 1993: Standard registration
- KEYBOARD CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- THE KEYBOARD CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY A SHINDLER OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Oleksandr Grynyuk | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maestro Evgeny Igorevitch Kissin | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR ELENA VOROTKO ARAM | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER AXWORTHY ARAM | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR MORITZ VON BREDOW | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor Leslie John Howard | Trustee |
|
||||||
MAESTRO ALFRED BRENDEL KBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORETTA CONCI-LEECH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR GEOFFREY NICE QC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICOLA BULGARI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.89k | £105.64k | £116.98k | £92.76k | £87.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.24k | £71.11k | £98.50k | £125.18k | £131.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF KEYBOARD MUSIC BY ASSISTING YOUNG MUSICIANS BEING PERSONS IN NEED IN SUCH A WAY AS TO ENABLE THEM TO BECOME SELF SUPPORTING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Raleigh Road
LONDON
N8 0HY
- Phone:
- 07770586919
- Email:
- sarahbiggs01@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window