Financial history WRAGBY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1017115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.63k £823 £1.83k £1.52k £2.21k
Total expenditure £1.10k £1.12k £1.72k £1.56k £1.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A