Financial history OSCAR BRISTOL (ORGANISATION FOR SICKLE CELL ANAEMIA RESEARCH)

Charity number: 1017124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.77k £14.57k £9.89k £33.25k £31.89k
Total expenditure £5.38k £3.98k £7.55k £26.77k £41.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £5.00k £9.53k