Governing document OSCAR BRISTOL (ORGANISATION FOR SICKLE CELL ANAEMIA RESEARCH)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JANUARY 1992 AND AMENDED 15 JANUARY 1993, 5 MARCH 1999 AND 10 JUNE 2010 as amended on 17 Jan 2023 as amended on 27 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM SICKLE CELL AND THALASSAEMIA DISORDERS.2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ORDER TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF SICLE CELL AND THALASSAEMIA DISORDERS.3) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE PREVALENCE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF SICKLE CELL AND THALASSAEMIA DISORDERS AND DISSEMINATE AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.