MARTHA LOUISE JACKSON BEQUEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
According to the trust deed the charity is solely for the benefits of residents in the parish of Holy Trinity, Headington Quarry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 February 1993: Standard registration
- JACKSON BEQUEST (Working name)
- JACKSON TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Laura Rebecca Biron | Chair | 18 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ann Taylor | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JONATHAN SMITH | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.93k | £4.12k | £4.88k | £1.24k | £12.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.09k | £4.60k | £3.64k | £700 | £10.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 14 NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
1) FOR RELIEF IN NEED 2) FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HEADINGTON QUARRY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Area of benefit
HEADINGTON QUARRY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD, OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Parish Office
46 Quarry Road
OXFORD
OX3 8NU
- Phone:
- 01865762931
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window