Accounts and annual returns FARNDON WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1017128
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 01 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 09 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 12 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required