NEATISHEAD, BARTON TURF AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We play a unique role in providing women with educational opportunities and the chance to build new skills, to take part in a wide variety of activities and to campaign on issues that matter to them and their communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 09 February 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Louise Moore | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Rosemary Church | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Mary Cook | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helene Sophia Hayden | Trustee | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jo Paul | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Trish Percival | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS Pat Young | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS DOLLY NEWCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.95k | £4.02k | £3.89k | £4.76k | £9.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.28k | £1.01k | £3.36k | £7.02k | £9.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 September 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC. DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS. HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE TO WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION, AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTISE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NEATISHEAD, BARTON TURF AND IRSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
CALLOW GREEN
BARTON TURF
NORWICH
NR12 8AS
- Phone:
- 01692535853
- Email:
- jomac.callow@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window