THE LABRADOR RESCUE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dormant
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 1993: Standard registration
- 01 July 2015: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 July 2015: Funds transferred to 1088198 THE LABRADOR RESCUE TRUST
- LABRADOR RESCUE (Working name)
- LABRADOR RESCUE TRUST (Previous name)
- LABRADOR RESCUE(SOUTH WEST) TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 22 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 13 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 01 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 14 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 1992, AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION OF 10 APRIL 1996, 28 FEBRUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS CAUSED TO DOGS AND IN PARTICULAR THE BREED KNOWN AS LABRADORS WHICH MAY BE ILL-TREATED ABANDONED REJECTED OR NEGLECTED.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window