POSITIVE STEPS OLDHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As an independent sector organisation, PSO is unique in England in the way it provides a range of integrated support services for young people. Its organisational mission is: To provide an integrated range of advice, information, guidance and support services which enable all individuals in Oldham and neighbouring boroughs to realise their full potential in work and life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,345,451
Donations and legacies | £176.98k | |
Charitable activities | £5.94m | |
Other trading activities | £74.82k | |
Investments | £155.45k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,280,861
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £6.28m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,747,042 from 6 government contract(s) and £404,461 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.28m | |
Retained for future use | £64.59k |
People

144 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Tameside
Governance
- 09 February 1993: Standard registration
- 24 July 2018: Funds received from 1132046 YOUTH ABOUT
- NEXT STEPS OLDHAM (Previous name)
- OLDHAM COMPACT (Previous name)
- OLDHAM EDUCATION, BUSINESS AND GUIDANCE SERVICES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Marie Forsdike | Chair | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Iffat Parveen | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Mahmood | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Zack Colin Maher | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Harewood | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Louise Harrison | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Umar Nasheen | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Mezreet Rasul | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vinesh Mistry | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Jane Roberts | Trustee | 11 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.42m | £6.20m | £5.63m | £6.21m | £6.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.11m | £7.01m | £6.44m | £6.44m | £6.28m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.73m | £3.93m | £3.48m | £3.48m | £3.75m | |
|
Income from government grants | £354.51k | £77.08k | £458.96k | £302.11k | £404.46k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £11.72k | £197.95k | £171.93k | £180.84k | £176.98k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £317.11k | £138.50k | £223.89k | £270.05k | £74.82k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.97m | £5.85m | £5.20m | £5.64m | £5.94m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £73.33k | £6.86k | £37.37k | £120.29k | £155.45k | |
|
Income - Other | £48.56k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.78m | £6.47m | £6.07m | £6.11m | £6.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £326.07k | £252.38k | £367.22k | £323.07k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.19k | £33.26k | £13.55k | £1.51m | £14.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £281.66k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £224.37k | £953.96k | £775.39k | £757.23k | £598.03k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.77m | £2.20m | £2.22m | £2.63m | £3.09m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£6.22m | -£13.20m | -£6.93m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £731.81k | £1.09m | £770.74k | £802.34k | £985.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORP 28/11/1990, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23/07/1992, 30/09/1997, 23/03/2001 AND 01/11/2006. ALSO, CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/03/2001, 05/10/2004 AND 06/12/2004 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ORDER TO PREPARE THEM FOR WORKING AND ADULT LIFE; (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FITS, INCLUDING PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; (C) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE; (D) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY; (E) THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE REHABILITATION OF YOUNG OFFENDERS; (F) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (G) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN SUCH LOCATIONS AS THE COMPANY IS COMMISSIONED TO DELIVER SERVICES; (H) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (I) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS ARISING FROM SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Positive Steps
80 Union Street
Oldham
OL1 1DJ
- Phone:
- 01616219370
- Email:
- info@positive-steps.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window