Trustees REALL LIMITED
Charity number: 1017255

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amita Poole | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Guis | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Shepard Farrar | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Friedemann Roy | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ranil De Silva | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jardine | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dhaval Rameshchandra Monani | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hakeem Dele Ogunniran | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Smith | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Mitlin | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN GEOFFREY TROOP | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.