12TH GATESHEAD (WHICKHAM LIONS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide learning activities for young adults & children. Provide outdoor activities for young adults & children. Promote scout ideals & standards of conduct for.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Gateshead
Governance
- 09 February 1993: Standard registration
- 12TH GATESHEAD SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Douglas Allan Short | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Short | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frazer Gregory | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jackson Hind | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Donna Robson | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEN MURRAY | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.84k | £7.72k | £5.82k | £8.22k | £13.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.45k | £6.76k | £4.50k | £11.74k | £14.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 March 2024 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELLECTUAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS,AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 THE ORCHARD
WHICKHAM
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE16 4HD
- Phone:
- 01914961066
- Email:
- kmurray500@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window