RUDGWICK PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1017298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Various fund raising activities to supply additional funding and support to Rudgwick Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £20,277
Total expenditure: £4,933

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 February 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RUDGWICK COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amey Kay Hewitt Chair 29 November 2024
None on record
Kelly Donaghey Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Emily Barton Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Karen Danielle Weideman Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Catherine Holly Woolgar Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.26k £14.72k £17.73k £15.07k £20.28k
Total expenditure £2.91k £1.21k £2.35k £2.40k £4.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 October 2024 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 September 2021 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RUDGWICK PRIMARY SCHOOL
TATES WAY
RUDGWICK
HORSHAM
RH12 3HW
Phone:
01403822151