FWBO (CENTRAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Buddhism: (i) to encourage members and others to live in accordance with the Teaching of the Buddha. (ii) to support ordained members of the Western Buddhist Order and other duly ordained Buddhists, at the discretion of the Council of the FWBO. (iii) to maintain close communication with and work in co operation with other groups with the same objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 February 1993: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER (CENTRAL OFFICE) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Lovering | Chair | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anne Morgan | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Damon Peterson | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £734 | £590 | £650 | £736 | £1.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £859 | £1.50k | £660 | £0 | £1.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 DECEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 9TH JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adhisthana
Coddington
Ledbury
HR8 1JL
- Phone:
- 01531641726
- Email:
- admin@adhisthana.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window