ALLEYN COURT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1017369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity acquired Alleyn Court School in 2015.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Southend-on-sea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE ALLEYN AND ETON HOUSE TRUST (Previous name)
  • THE ALLEYN COURT AND ETON HOUSE TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaine Oddie Trustee 20 January 2023
None on record
GRAHAM REEDER Trustee 13 October 2022
ROTARY CLUB OF WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
BALMORAL COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE ROTARY DISTRICT 1240 TRUST FUND
Received: On time
George William Denys Wilcox Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
RICHARD MARK GREEN Trustee 12 April 2011
PARENTS ASSOCIATION OF GROVE WOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days
SARAH NICOLE DRUMMOND Trustee 12 April 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £3.16m £3.29m £3.30m £3.33m £3.35m
Total expenditure £2.93m £3.07m £3.05m £3.22m £3.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £40.21k £48.85k £12.83k £12.41k £8.06k
Income - Other trading activities £3.10m £3.04m £3.16m £3.31m £3.32m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.30k £2.39k £1.60k £1.42k £2.39k
Income - Other £20.40k £204.75k £127.73k £5.41k £10.07k
Income - Legacies £0 £42.06k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.37k £0 £0 £13.52k £14.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £33.03k £18.67k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £14.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.91m £3.03m £3.03m £3.20m £3.31m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £600.21k £553.89k £520.42k £503.38k £948.36k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £665.44k £829.61k £1.02m £1.11m £742.84k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £571.78k £471.33k £392.52k £349.24k £426.46k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 17 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 21 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
75 SPRINGFIELD ROAD
CHELMSFORD
ESSEX
CM2 6JB
Phone:
01245455400
Website:

No information available