Financial history THE RUSSELL SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1017405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £12.41k £12.41k £20.05k £18.98k £17.85k
Total expenditure £13.78k £13.78k £5.62k £15.19k £29.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A