ST AUGUSTINE OF CANTERBURY NURSERY PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a sessional pre-school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £83,624 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 17 February 1993: Standard registration
- ST AUGUSTINE OF CANTERBURY PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janine McCann | Chair | 31 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Emily Louise Owens | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Niamh Patch | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Charan Kaur | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Lisa Dewfall | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Michael Norris | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.25k | £55.70k | £73.64k | £75.85k | £114.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.28k | £69.30k | £65.44k | £78.36k | £94.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £67.73k | £43.13k | £53.78k | £58.16k | £83.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1991 AMENDED 10 NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE PLAYGROUP
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOSCOMBE CRESCENT
DOWNEND
BRISTOL
BS16 6QR
- Phone:
- 01179561166
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window