Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF YSGOL PARC Y LLAN SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1017449
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 25 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 August 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required