BRANDLING VILLAGE PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of pre-school education for 3 and 4 year olds in Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, particularly Jesmond, Gosforth areas. Supporting good links with the local community, including the church, schools and businesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 19 February 1993: Standard registration
- 04 July 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 July 2013: Funds transferred to 1152063 BRANDLING VILLAGE PRESCHOOL
- BRANDLING VILLAGE PRE SCHOOL (Working name)
- JESMOND UNITED REFORMED CHURCH PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.68k | £25.81k | £47.19k | £42.00k | £6.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.79k | £29.08k | £28.65k | £31.24k | £18.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 25 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 25 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 25 June 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 30 March 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 30 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 14 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 14 June 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED 22 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window