Accounts and annual returns CAMBRIDGE S O F A
Charity number: 1017524
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2011 | 20 June 2012 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2011 | 16 February 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 22 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 06 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 08 March 2010 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 03 September 2009 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window