OLVESTON PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating as a Pre-School providing early years education for children aged from 2.5 to 5.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £132,252 from 40 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 February 1993: Standard registration
- 16 June 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- OLVESTON PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.62k | £120.67k | £123.25k | £120.22k | £173.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.01k | £120.40k | £123.25k | £134.70k | £173.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £64.19k | £94.91k | N/A | £92.01k | £132.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window