Financial history CYSTIC FIBROSIS COMFORT FUND

Charity number: 1017576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.29k £18.50k £24.46k £6.85k £5.46k
Total expenditure £22.38k £31.54k £18.87k £16.07k £11.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A