Trustees CYSTIC FIBROSIS COMFORT FUND
Charity number: 1017576

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shane Brett Brennan | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Ann Harriman | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tomasz Modzelewski | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth SMITH | Trustee | 04 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elizabeth Nichols | Trustee | 04 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE LINDSAY | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHERYN WEDLOCK | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN SUSAN BADLAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.