LONDON HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve on behalf of the townspeople of Greater London and of the nation at large buildings of particular beauty or historical, architectural or constructional interest. The charity achieves this by working with local authorities, statutory bodies, grant and loan giving agencies to take on, restore, repair and refurbish buildings at risk to bring them back into beneficial use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £124,907 from 3 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 February 1993: Standard registration
- HOLTOP (Working name)
- HERITAGE OF LONDON TRUST OPERATIONS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Ruth Nayler | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Eleanor van Heyningen | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Boryana Ivanova | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lesley Beacock | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Chania Ann Chayira Fox | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Alaric Leigh FCA | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Clare Margaret Liddell | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Howard King Swindall | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas Atkinson | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip David Smith | Trustee | 19 March 2020 |
|
|||||
David Frank Gibson RIBA AABC | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Buckingham BA MSc | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Susan Fraser | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALEC PAUL FORSHAW | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.80k | £109.80k | £104.89k | £442.13k | £174.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.94k | £111.94k | £104.04k | £156.57k | £322.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £18.91k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £33.64k | £61.67k | £355.04k | £124.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH DECEMBER 1992 as amended on 09 Aug 2019 as amended on 19 Mar 2020 as amended on 19 Mar 2020 as amended on 16 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF GREATER LONDON AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND GREATER LONDON AFORESAID IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 290(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1971) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Larking Gowen LLP
1st Floor, Prospect House
Rouen Road
NORWICH
NR1 1RE
- Phone:
- 01603 624181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window