EAST LONDON SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS MOVEMENT AND DANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide physical education to Children, Adults in multiple sports and dance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Hackney
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 23 February 1993: Standard registration
- EAST LONDON GYMNASTICS CENTRE (Working name)
- EAST LONDON GYM CLUB (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA ZAMMIT | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600.24k | £432.23k | £638.48k | £559.36k | £499.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £622.89k | £379.30k | £485.59k | £473.12k | £434.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | £94.55k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £600.24k | N/A | £543.93k | £559.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £485.59k | £473.12k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £622.89k | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH JULY 1990, AND AMENDED 2ND FEBRUARY 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS POLYTECHNICS UNIVERSITIES OR OTHER CENTRES OF EDUCATION PRINCIPALLY FOR THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND O0CCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS AND WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THIS OBJECT AND TO ENCOURAGE SUCH PUPILS TO PARTICIPATE IN GYMNASTICS. (1)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES (11)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF GYMNASTICS AND SPORTS EQUIPMENT (111)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY IN THE PROVISION OF COURSES LECTURES DEMONSTRATIONS AND COACHING FOR PUPILS OF SCHOOLS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND FOR TEACHERS AND COACHES WHO ORGANISE OR SUPERVISE THE PERFORMANCE OR COACHING OF GYMNASTICS (1V)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF THE TRAINING OF TEACHERS AND COACHES FOR THE PURPOSE OF TRAINING GYMNASTICS AT SCHOOLS AND CLUBS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING & DAGENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 TRIUMPH ROAD
BECKTON
LONDON
E6 5LW
- Phone:
- 02075114488
- Email:
- info@eastlondongym.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window