Trustees HUTTON AND HOWICK WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1017692

Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivien Joan Hastewell | Chair | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Forder | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Reynolds | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margareta Toft | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diana Slorick | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN PATON | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Farrant | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WILSON | Trustee | 17 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.