WEST MERCIA COUNTY GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As part of Girlguiding UK, West Mercia Guides purpose is to enable girls and young women develop their potential and to make a difference to the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 26 February 1993: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING WEST MERCIA (Working name)
- WEST MERCIA COUNTY GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Becky Powell | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hughes | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Drohan | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Lucas | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Bleakley | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Freya Wenman | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrene Clarke | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Justine Clarke | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Bolton | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Belcher | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Helen Cartwright | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kristie Mander | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Collett | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Johanne Harrison | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
WENDY COWDREY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.47k | £69.62k | £6.21k | £37.35k | £63.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.63k | £30.17k | £23.71k | £54.12k | £62.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mercia Point
Hordern Road
Wolverhampton
WV6 0HT
- Phone:
- 01902 758246
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window