Trustees HOVE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1017761

Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bonita Casciello | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ZENTNER | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE Lefeuve | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELENA HEATH | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Barker | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Dee | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Spender | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Wraige | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Haroutunian | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.