3RD WEST WICKHAM SCOUT GROUP (ST JOHN THE BAPTIST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A fully operational Scout Group offering education, motivational skills, enjoyment and training of young male and female children / young people from all backgrounds using the National Scouting organisation as a framework, being based in West Wickham, Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
Governance
- 26 February 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick McGarey | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Joseph Maher | Trustee | 25 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Carvell | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND JONATHAN WARD | Trustee | 04 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALYS HELM | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEITH DAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE KEARNS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERRY NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.03k | £17.91k | £22.20k | £26.19k | £19.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.71k | £10.31k | £20.11k | £27.18k | £24.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 4TH JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1948, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967, AND 19TH JULY 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
WEST WICKHAM AND ADJOINING PARISHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tiepigs Lane
Bromley
BR4 9BT
- Phone:
- 01959 574585
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window