YORKLEY UNDER 5S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides pre school education for children aged from 2 years nine months. The group also runs a Mother and Toddler group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £154,688 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 February 1993: Standard registration
- YORKLEY PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
fiona thomas | Chair | 09 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Thorne | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Barclay | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren James | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Mason | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.07k | £116.74k | £172.64k | £194.63k | £230.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.90k | £174.70k | £170.86k | £206.66k | £231.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £116.32k | N/A | £154.69k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £114.05k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 September 2023 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 August 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 August 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 FEBRUARY 1992 AS AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO EMBODY THE VISION OF PATA THROUGH THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY (VOLUNTARY MANAGED) GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE PLAYGROUP
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yorkley County School
Lydney Road
Yorkley
Lydney
GL15 4RR
- Phone:
- 01594564918
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window