SHOPMOBILITY WATFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Loan of mobility equipment for disabled people to use while shopping in Watford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £42,461 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR LILLINGTON | Chair | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bond | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eric Collyer | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Francis | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Kirby | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bagley | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Phelan | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Hughes | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL THOMPSON | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE PAYNE | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Shepherd | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Cunnane | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RUTLEDGE | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA SEAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.09k | £127.72k | £98.12k | £118.16k | £122.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.27k | £106.34k | £91.27k | £99.87k | £103.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.16k | £41.07k | £47.63k | £58.04k | £42.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH MAY 1992, AMENDED 18TH JANUARY 1993 AND 18 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH DISABILITY IN WATFORD(AND DISTRICT) BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN PARTICULAR WHEELCHAIRS AND SIMILAR EQUIPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY AND CONDITION OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WATFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHOPMOBILITY
CHURCH CAR PARK
EXCHANGE ROAD
WATFORD
WD18 0BU
- Phone:
- 01923211020
- Email:
- info@shopmobilitywatford.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window