Trustees SHOPMOBILITY WATFORD
Charity number: 1017812

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR LILLINGTON | Chair | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bond | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eric Collyer | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bradley Francis | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Kirby | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bagley | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Phelan | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Hughes | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL THOMPSON | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE PAYNE | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Shepherd | Trustee | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Cunnane | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RUTLEDGE | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA SEAL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.