EXOUSIA WORLDWIDE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general church activities, women, men and youth meetings, community assistance (advice and guidance, support and counselling)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Lewisham
Governance
- 01 March 1993: Standard registration
- EXOUSIA COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- VAHP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN MILLER | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.74k | £40.22k | £43.76k | £46.28k | £34.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.92k | £32.30k | £42.64k | £47.42k | £35.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 July 2024 | 546 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 July 2024 | 546 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2024 | 909 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2024 | 909 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/05/1992 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/09/2011
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE.(2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK (3) THE PROVISION OF A CRECH, NURSERY AND HOLIDAY PLAY SCHEME FOR THE STATE CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW THE AGE OF 16 AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE SAID CHILDREN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF ANY ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE VOCATIONAL TRAINING SCHOOLS FOR THE VOCATIONAL TRAINING SCHOOLS FOR THE RELIGIOUS TRAINING OF PREACHERS AND EVANGALISTS. (5) THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMODATION FOR THE HOMELESS PERSONS IN NEED OR IN NECESSITIOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 BRYDEN CLOSE
LONDON
SE26 5LL
- Phone:
- 07863280394
- Email:
- exousiawm@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window