ST GEORGE'S WEYBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education by the provision and conduct of a school or schools for boys and girls to enable the fulfilment of their academic potential and personal development within an ethos of Christian ideals which derive from the traditions and teaching of the Roman Catholic Church and by ancillary or incidental education or religious activities for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£32,459,129
Donations and legacies | £211.53k | |
Charitable activities | £31.53m | |
Other trading activities | £634.40k | |
Investments | £84.54k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£29,860,026
Raising funds | £981.10k | |
Charitable activities | £28.88m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £981.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £28.88m | |
Retained for future use | £2.60m |
People

455 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 13 |
£70k to £80k | 9 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 01 March 1993: Standard registration
- ST GEORGE'S COLLEGE WEYBRIDGE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Charles Muller | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hanley-Browne | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kalvir Gosal | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Fawcett | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Satchel | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Burnham | Trustee | 23 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Bicarregui | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Denis Nowlan | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Shevlin | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Gordon | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|||||
JASON HOOD | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.38m | £25.16m | £26.70m | £31.33m | £32.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.04m | £25.80m | £26.02m | £28.37m | £29.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £687.29k | £426.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £569.27k | £342.72k | £357.16k | £440.95k | £211.53k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £554.98k | £507.55k | £499.79k | £571.28k | £634.40k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £25.19m | £23.59m | £25.40m | £30.30m | £31.53m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £69.57k | £28.42k | £19.51k | £15.63k | £84.54k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £687.29k | £426.36k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £6.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £24.04m | £24.59m | £25.13m | £27.43m | £28.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.00m | £1.20m | £897.37k | £934.91k | £981.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £116.16k | £123.21k | £125.52k | £134.18k | £159.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £53.26m | £54.17m | £54.73m | £55.83m | £55.07m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £10.96m | £9.99m | £9.60m | £8.05m | £13.73m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £21.45m | £22.03m | £21.53m | £18.11m | £20.43m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/02/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF A SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS TO ENABLE THE FULFILMENT OF THEIR ACADEMIC POTENTIAL AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT WITHIN AN ETHOS OF CHRISTIAN IDEALS WHICH DERIVE FROM THE TRADITIONS AND TEACHING OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL OR RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GEORGES COLLEGE
WEYBRIDGE ROAD
ADDLESTONE
KT15 2QS
- Phone:
- 01932839312
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window