SLOUGH WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranging meetings for public worship, which includes bible education and training in Christian living. preaching the Christian message to the public within the congregation area. Distributing bibles and other religious literature. All of these services and facilities are provided without charge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Slough
Governance
- 04 March 1993: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- SLOUGH/MANOR PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £2.93k | £5.04k | £6.54k | £5.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47k | £3.83k | £5.86k | £6.09k | £6.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 28 May 2018 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 11 August 2017 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF CONSTITUTION DATED 28 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
THE PRACTICE AND ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOUNDED ON THE HOLY BIBLE, INCLUDING THE PREACHING OF THE GOOD NEWS GOD'S KINGDOM BY JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE CONGREGATION AREA AND THE HOLDING OF MEETINGS FOR PUBLIC CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.P.
Area of benefit
SLOUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window