Accounts and annual returns BRITISH TUNNELLING SOCIETY

Charity number: 1017887
Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2024 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 October 2024 345 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 February 2023 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 February 2023 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 March 2022 131 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window