Governing document BRITISH TUNNELLING SOCIETY
Charity number: 1017887

Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 1976 18 OCTOBER 1990, 21 JANUARY 1993, 16TH MAY 2002 AND 19TH MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AND TO PROMOTE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF TUNNELLING,INCLUDING THE CREATION AND USE OF UNDERGROUND SPACE BY FOSTERING UNDERSTANDING, EXPERIENCE, INTEREST AND RESEARCH THEREIN
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.