Trustees BRITISH TUNNELLING SOCIETY
Charity number: 1017887

Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Corcoran | Chair | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Leggett | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Austin | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Philip Charles Smith | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Omar Mutasim Mohammed | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Lock | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Antony Coupland Parker | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Kenneth Rowan Kinnear | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Jane Haig | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kei Fai Ken Kwok | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Russell Antony Mason | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Greenhalgh | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Divik Bandopadhyaya | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Garbutt | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROD YOUNG | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Arabel Vilas Serin | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.