Trustees MATFIELD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1017899

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony David Richards | Chair | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hawkes | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bilney | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Cooper | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Cook | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Milton Charles Cartwright | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Jayne Middleton | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Coombes | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Kember | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE KLEMPAU | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.