THE FURNITURE SCHEME RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity accepts donations of furniture in good condition from the general public and others making this primarily available to people in need at minimal cost - though now also open to the general public so as to encourage more reuse of furniture and household items. It offers a training scheme for young people in basic carpentry skills with an emphasis on refurbishment and recycling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 04 March 1993: Standard registration
- 18 October 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 October 2010: Funds transferred to 1133019 RICHMOND FURNITURE SCHEME
- THE FURNITURE SCHEME (Working name)
- THE FURNITURE EXCHANGE RICHMOND (Previous name)
- THE FURNITURE EXCHANGE RICHMOND UPON THAMES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.03k | £163.94k | £187.91k | £173.16k | £133.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.04k | £150.53k | £169.98k | £129.13k | £135.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 10 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 09 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 19 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 14 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 09 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 13 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 13 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 15 February 2007 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 22 September 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 AUGUST 1992, AS AMENDED ON 8 JANUARY 1997, AND BY A SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 14 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY ACCEPTING DONATIONS OF FURNITURE WHICH IS IN GOOD CONDITION FROM THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND OTHERS, MAKING THIS AVAILABLE TO PEOPLE IN NEED AT MINIMAL COST REFERRED BY LOCAL AUTHORITY DEPARTMENTS OF SOCIAL SERVICES, HOUSING, THE PROBATION SERVICE, THE HEALTH AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY GROUPS AND SIMILAR BODIES: TO ENCOURAGE RECYCLING AND REFURBISHMENT OF FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO THIS END.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE RICHMOND UPON THAMES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window