NEW AGE SPIRITUALIST CHURCH (HULL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spiritualist church, providing church services, spiritual healing, funeral services, providing a listening ear, and spiritual advice and comfort where requested
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 02 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Cunningham | Trustee | 24 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
joanne Alice Kendall | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
RITA LAWRIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARLENE BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.15k | £3.64k | £6.19k | £8.10k | £9.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.79k | £3.42k | £6.20k | £7.86k | £8.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2025 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
N.A.S.C. 23, John Street
HULL
HU2 8DH
- Phone:
- 01482 587014
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window