Trustees DERSINGHAM EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1018011
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cynthia Parr | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Snell | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Fettes | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Wright | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet North | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mehr | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Isobel Mundy | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Mason | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Childs | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patrica Emsden | Trustee | 21 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Diann Southgate | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.