Trustees TEAM CROMWELL
Charity number: 1018132

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Seton | Chair | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Nelson | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Talbot | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Pass | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Trudi Ashton | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Royle | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Wray | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Smillie | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALI SYED | Trustee | 06 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.