Accounts and annual returns RAVEN TRUST AT KEELE UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 1018133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 11 June 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 June 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 June 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 February 2021 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required