TRINITY FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trinity Fellowship Trust is based in Handsworth, Birmingham. The Trust continues to support Living Waters Community Church (LWCC) in their outreach charity work in India (orphanage) & Uganda (primary schools). Recent Community based activities include a twice-weekly programme aimed at supporting black and minority ethnic elderly people and more recent work targeting high-risk vulnerable women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- India
- Uganda
Governance
- 04 March 1993: Standard registration
- TRINITY FELLOWSHIP TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DWAYNE MAGINLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
VERONICA ROBINSON | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Shervington | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.54k | £6.63k | £3.73k | £4.64k | £3.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.30k | £8.73k | £4.83k | £3.43k | £5.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 December 2024 | 399 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 March 2022 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 April 2021 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.2.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BIRMINGHAM
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 ST. PETERS ROAD
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B20 3RP
- Phone:
- 01215233415
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window