AMESBURY EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educating women to provide an effective role in the community, to expand their horizons and to develop and pass on important skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 05 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Davies | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Lorraine Duffield | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA AYMES | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mathias | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Mary Leslie | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE JANET SPENCE | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Down | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGOT JONES | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH NASH | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY SHEA | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pam Barnard | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHAULA MAUREEN JULIE CRABTREE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.43k | £1.71k | £220 | £831 | £1.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.86k | £910 | £658 | £2.13k | £1.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE AMESBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O W F W I
17 COUCH LANE
DEVIZES
WILTS
SN10 1EB
- Phone:
- 01380739340
- Email:
- fedsec@wiltshirewi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window